AL SB149 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Ways and Means Education first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Broadband internet access in rural areas, Economic and Community Affairs Dept., grant program, Fund and Legislative Oversight Committees, created, Ala. Broadband Accessibility Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Broadband internet access in rural areas, Economic and Community Affairs Dept., grant program, Fund and Legislative Oversight Committees, created, Ala. Broadband Accessibility Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-21 - Senate - Scofield motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Sanford motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Scofield motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21HouseWays and Means Education first Amendment Offered
2018-03-21SenateAssigned Act No. 2018-395.
2018-03-21HouseSignature Requested
2018-03-21SenateEnrolled
2018-03-21HouseConcurred in Second House Amendment
2018-03-21SenateScofield motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 925
2018-03-21SenateConcurrence Requested
2018-03-20HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 912
2018-03-20HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 911
2018-03-20HouseLedbetter Amendment Offered
2018-02-01SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 279
2018-03-20HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 910
2018-02-01SenateScofield motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
2018-02-01SenateSanford Amendment Offered
2018-03-20HouseWays and Means Education Amendment Offered
2018-02-01SenateSanford motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 278
2018-03-20HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 909
2018-02-01SenateSanford Amendment Offered
2018-03-20HouseWays and Means Education first Substitute Offered
2018-02-01SenateScofield motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 277
2018-03-20HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-02-01SenateScofield first Substitute Offered
2018-03-15HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and 1 amendment
2018-02-06HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
2018-02-01SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-02-06SenateEngrossed
2018-01-30SenateScofield motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2018-01-30SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2018-01-25SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-11SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB149&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/SB149-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/SB149-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/SB149-enr.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/190954-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/191028-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/191024-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/193019-7.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/193353-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/193336-1.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=581428&VOTE=26&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=585539&VOTE=277&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=585541&VOTE=278&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=585545&VOTE=279&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=598132&VOTE=909&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=598137&VOTE=910&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=598139&VOTE=911&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=598142&VOTE=912&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=598342&VOTE=925&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback