AL SB147 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-06 - Assigned Act No. 2022-421.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-06 - Assigned Act No. 2022-421.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Meetings of governmental bodies, with members from two or more counties, participation by electronic means authorized under certain conditions, may be counted for a quorum, means of access required to be published, Sec. 36-25A-5.1 am'd.
Title
Meetings of governmental bodies, with members from two or more counties, participation by electronic means authorized under certain conditions, may be counted for a quorum, means of access required to be published, Sec. 36-25A-5.1 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Arthur Orr [R] | Sen. Jimmy Holley [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - Senate - Reed motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 960 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Chestnut motion to Table Roll Call 693 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Chestnut motion to Table Roll Call 692 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - HBIR: Chestnut motion to Adopt Roll Call 691 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 156 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 155 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - SBIR: Singleton motion to Adopt Roll Call 154 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Chestnut motion to Table Roll Call 693 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Chestnut motion to Table Roll Call 692 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - HBIR: Chestnut motion to Adopt Roll Call 691 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 156 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 155 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - SBIR: Singleton motion to Adopt Roll Call 154 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | House | Assigned Act No. 2022-421. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Forwarded to Governor at 2:04 p.m. on April 6, 2022 |
2022-04-06 | House | State Government second Amendment Offered |
2022-04-06 | House | Signature Requested |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-04-06 | House | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Reed motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 960 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2022-04-05 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Voice Vote 905 |
2022-04-05 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote 904 |
2022-04-05 | House | Chestnut first Substitute Offered |
2022-04-05 | House | Chestnut motion to withdraw his amendment adopted Voice Vote |
2022-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-17 | House | Chestnut motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote |
2022-03-17 | House | Chestnut Amendment Offered |
2022-03-17 | House | Chestnut motion to Table adopted Roll Call 693 |
2022-03-17 | House | State Government 2ND Amendment Offered |
2022-03-17 | House | Chestnut motion to Table adopted Roll Call 692 |
2022-03-17 | House | State Government 1ST Amendment Offered |
2022-03-17 | House | Third Reading Carried Over |
2022-03-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments |
2022-02-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Engrossed |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 156 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 155 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Governmental Affairs Amendment Offered |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB361 (Same As) 2022-02-16 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government