AL SB147 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-05 - Assigned Act No. 2014-160.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-05 - Assigned Act No. 2014-160.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Alarm systems, alarm monitoring companies, certain verification of alarm signal required, Electronic Security Board of Licensure to enforce, Sec. 34-1A-1 am'd; Sec. 34-1A-11 added
Title
Alarm systems, alarm monitoring companies, certain verification of alarm signal required, Electronic Security Board of Licensure to enforce, Sec. 34-1A-1 am'd; Sec. 34-1A-11 added
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - Senate - Holley motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - Senate - Holley motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-05 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2014-160. |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-03-05 | House | Signature Requested |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2014-03-05 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 580 |
2014-03-05 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-20 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-02-11 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 302 |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Holley motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 301 |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Holley first Substitute Offered |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |