AL SB146 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-01 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-01 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Judicial system officer or employee, threatening harm or violence against, crime established, death penalty, Secs. 13A-5-40, 13A-5-49 am'd.
Title
Judicial system officer or employee, threatening harm or violence against, crime established, death penalty, Secs. 13A-5-40, 13A-5-49 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. William Beasley [D] | Sen. Roger Bedford [D] | Sen. Priscilla Dunn [D] | Sen. Jerry Fielding [D] |
Sen. Tammy Irons [D] | Sen. Rodger Smitherman [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-01 - House - Canfield motion to Carry Over Temporarily (Y: 66 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-01 | Further Consideration | |
2011-06-01 | Canfield motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Roll Call 1047 | |
2011-06-01 | Third Reading Carried Over | |
2011-04-27 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-04-12 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary | |
2011-04-12 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 234 | |
2011-04-12 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-24 | Reported from Judiciary as Favorable | |
2011-03-03 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |