AL SB145 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-06 - Assigned Act No. 2018-54.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Jackson Co., Cumberland Mountain Water and Fire Protection Authority, natural gas service, authorized to provide, const. amend.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Jackson Co., Cumberland Mountain Water and Fire Protection Authority, natural gas service, authorized to provide, const. amend.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-06 - House - Hanes motion to Miscellaneous (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 51 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2018-02-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 25 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-06SenateAssigned Act No. 2018-54.
2018-02-06SenateEnrolled
2018-02-06HouseSignature Requested
2018-02-06SenatePassed Second House
2018-02-06HouseHanes motion to adopt Local Application adopted Roll Call 184
2018-02-06HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 183
2018-02-06HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-02-01HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-30HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
2018-01-30SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 169
2018-01-30SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-01-25SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-11SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback