AL SB145 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-21 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
Pending: House Local Legislation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Lincoln, Talladega Co., alcoholic beverages, Sunday sales authorized under certain conditions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lincoln, Talladega Co., alcoholic beverages, Sunday sales authorized under certain conditions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-01-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-01-21HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
2014-01-21SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 42
2014-01-21SenateThird Reading Passed
2014-01-16SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2014-01-14SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback