AL SB145 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-01 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Drivers' licenses, suspension based on drug convictions, certain drug offenses deleted from law, certification of act by Governor to U. S. Department of Transportation, Sec. 13A-12-291 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Drivers' licenses, suspension based on drug convictions, certain drug offenses deleted from law, certification of act by Governor to U. S. Department of Transportation, Sec. 13A-12-291 am'd.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-01 Indefinitely Postponed
2011-05-31 Beasley motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
2011-05-31 Third Reading Carried Over
2011-04-14 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2011-03-03 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback