AL SB143 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Pending third reading on day 25 Favorable from Judiciary with 1 substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Marriage, contract for, recording by judge of probate, transmission to Vital Statistics office, content of contract, Secs. 30-1-9, 30-1-10, 30-1-11, 30-1-13, 30-1-14 repealed; Secs. 22-9A-17, 30-1-5, 30-1-12, 30-1-16 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marriage, contract for, recording by judge of probate, transmission to Vital Statistics office, content of contract, Secs. 30-1-9, 30-1-10, 30-1-11, 30-1-13, 30-1-14 repealed; Secs. 22-9A-17, 30-1-5, 30-1-12, 30-1-16 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Albritton motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-20HousePending third reading on day 25 Favorable from Judiciary with 1 substitute
2016-04-20HouseJudiciary first Substitute Offered
2016-04-20HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2016-03-15HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
2016-03-15SenateEngrossed
2016-03-15SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 372
2016-03-15SenateAlbritton motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 371
2016-03-15SenateJudiciary first Substitute Offered
2016-03-15SenateThird Reading Passed
2016-03-03SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2016-02-03SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback