AL SB142 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Assigned Act No. 2021-460.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Self-service food vendors, vending machines and micro markets defined, Agriculture and Industries to regulate

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Self-service food vendors, vending machines and micro markets defined, Agriculture and Industries to regulate

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1132 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - HBIR: Mooney motion to Adopt Roll Call 1131 (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 310 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - SBIR: Whatley motion to Adopt Roll Call 309 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-06SenateAssigned Act No. 2021-460.
2021-05-06HouseSignature Requested
2021-05-06SenateEnrolled
2021-05-06SenatePassed Second House
2021-05-06HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1132
2021-05-06HouseThird Reading Passed
2021-03-11HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2021-03-02HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health
2021-03-02SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 310
2021-03-02SenateThird Reading Passed
2021-02-24SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2021-02-02SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
114621Amended CodeSee Bill Text
114655Amended CodeSee Bill Text
11466Amended CodeSee Bill Text
17133Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB142&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/SB142-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/SB142-enr.pdf
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-41878.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-42251.htm
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=648094&VOTE=309&BODY=S&INST=SBIR%20for%20SB142&SESS=1077
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=648096&VOTE=310&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=663817&VOTE=1131&BODY=H&INST=HBIR%20for%20SB142&SESS=1077
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=663819&VOTE=1132&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments 750

feedback