AL SB142 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-27 - Assigned Act No. 2016-259.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-27 - Assigned Act No. 2016-259.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Impaired Drivers Trust Fund, name changed to Alabama Head and Spinal Cord Injury Trust Fund, Secs. 16-38A-1, 16-38A-2, 16-38A-4, 32-5A-191, 32-5A-191.2 am'd.
Title
Impaired Drivers Trust Fund, name changed to Alabama Head and Spinal Cord Injury Trust Fund, Secs. 16-38A-1, 16-38A-2, 16-38A-4, 32-5A-191, 32-5A-191.2 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Reed [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-27 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-27 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2016-259. |
2016-04-27 | House | Signature Requested |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2016-04-27 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 741 |
2016-04-27 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2016-03-23 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-03-15 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 327 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health and Human Services |