AL SB140 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Education Policy first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Sex education, public K-12 school, content and course materials revised, Sec. 16-40A-2 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sex education, public K-12 school, content and course materials revised, Sec. 16-40A-2 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02HouseEducation Policy first Amendment Offered
2019-05-02HousePending third reading on day 16 Favorable from Education Policy with 1 amendment
2019-05-02HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2019-04-18HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy
2019-04-16SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 272
2019-04-16SenateThird Reading Passed
2019-04-03SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-03-19SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback