AL SB14 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to marital and domestic relations; to amend Section 30-5-5, Code of Alabama 1975, to further provide for exemption from court costs and fees for certain actions related to protection orders.
Title
Relating to marital and domestic relations; to amend Section 30-5-5, Code of Alabama 1975, to further provide for exemption from court costs and fees for certain actions related to protection orders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-24 - House - Concur In and Adopt (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Concur In and Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - READ A THIRD TIME AND PASSED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Concur In and Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - READ A THIRD TIME AND PASSED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-24 | House | Enacted |
2023-05-24 | House | Concur In and Adopt |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Concur In and Adopt |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Executive Amendment ID926 |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Enrolled |
2023-04-19 | House | Ready to Enroll |
2023-04-18 | House | Read a Third Time and Pass |
2023-04-18 | House | On Third Reading in Second House |
2023-04-12 | House | Read Second Time in Second House |
2023-04-12 | House | Reported Out of Committee in Second House |
2023-04-12 | House | Reported Favorably from House Ways and Means General Fund |
2023-04-05 | House | Carry Over by House Ways and Means General Fund |
2023-03-23 | House | Referred to Committee to House Ways and Means General Fund |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Read First Time in Second House |
2023-03-23 | Senate | READ A THIRD TIME AND PASSED |
2023-03-23 | Senate | On Third Reading in House of Origin |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Read Second Time in House of Origin |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Reported Favorably from Senate Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Senate Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Prefiled |