AL SB14 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Assigned Act No. 2019-508.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Assigned Act No. 2019-508.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Education, public schools, grades 6 to 12, allow elective courses on the study of the Bible and display artifacts, monuments, symbols, and text related to the study of the Bible, State Board of Education to implement rules and policies
Title
Education, public schools, grades 6 to 12, allow elective courses on the study of the Bible and display artifacts, monuments, symbols, and text related to the study of the Bible, State Board of Education to implement rules and policies
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Melson [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - House - Ledbetter motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - Ledbetter motion to Accede (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Marsh motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Melson motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Melson motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - Ledbetter motion to Accede (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Marsh motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Melson motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Melson motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2019-508. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor at 5:58 p.m. on May 30, 2019 |
2019-05-30 | House | Signature Requested |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-05-30 | House | Rafferty intended to vote "Nay" |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Concurred in Conference Report |
2019-05-30 | House | Ledbetter motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1201 |
2019-05-30 | House | Conference Report concurrence requested |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1365 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Conference Report |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2019-05-28 | House | Ledbetter motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 1096 House appoints Ledbetter, Rowe and Grimsley |
2019-05-28 | House | Conference Committee Requested |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Marsh motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 1176 P&PO appoints Melson, Chesteen and Beasley |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2019-05-23 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 935 |
2019-05-23 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 934 |
2019-05-23 | House | Allen Amendment Offered |
2019-05-23 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 933 |
2019-05-23 | House | Drummond Amendment Offered |
2019-05-23 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-15 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-03 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Engrossed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 91 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Smitherman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 90 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Smitherman Amendment Offered |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Melson motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Melson motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 34 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Melson motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 33 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Education Policy Amendment Offered |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Education Policy Amendment Offered |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education Policy |