AL SB14 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-10 - Forwarded to Governor on May 10, 2012 at 4:00 p.m. on May 10, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-10 - Forwarded to Governor on May 10, 2012 at 4:00 p.m. on May 10, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Competitive bids, contracts of higher education institutions, minimum amount increased, Sec. 41-16-20 am'd. (2012-20153)
Title
Competitive bids, contracts of higher education institutions, minimum amount increased, Sec. 41-16-20 am'd. (2012-20153)
Sponsors
Sen. Gerald Dial [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-04-28 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-04-28 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-04-28 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-04-28 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-10 | Forwarded to Governor on May 10, 2012 at 4:00 p.m. on May 10, 2012 | |
2012-05-10 | Assigned Act No. 2012-462. | |
2012-05-10 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-10 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-10 | Passed Second House | |
2012-05-10 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1496 | |
2012-05-10 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-05-02 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-04-26 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government | |
2012-04-26 | Engrossed | |
2012-04-26 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 785 | |
2012-04-26 | Dial motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 784 | |
2012-04-26 | Fiscal Responsibility and Accountability first Substitute Offered | |
2012-04-26 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-15 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2012-02-07 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Accountability |