AL SB139 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-18 - Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Constitution, Campaigns and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-18 - Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Constitution, Campaigns and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Ten Commandments, display of on state property and at public schools, authorized, const. amend.
Title
Ten Commandments, display of on state property and at public schools, authorized, const. amend.
Sponsors
Sen. Gerald Dial [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-18 | House | Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Constitution, Campaigns and Elections |
2017-05-18 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-05-11 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1034 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Motion to Carry Over as Unfinished Business adopted Voice Vote |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Rules Petition to Cease Debate offered |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Dial motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Dial motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Constitution, Ethics and Elections |