AL SB139 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-17 - Delivered to Governor at 3:10 p.m. on April 17, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-17 - Delivered to Governor at 3:10 p.m. on April 17, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Highways, Bridges, and Roads, civil liability of person or entity constructing with state or subdivision of state abated as provided by common law
Title
Highways, Bridges, and Roads, civil liability of person or entity constructing with state or subdivision of state abated as provided by common law
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-11 - Senate - Rules Petition to cease debate (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-11 - Senate - Scofield motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-11 - Senate - Rules Petition to cease debate (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-11 - Senate - Scofield motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-17 | Delivered to Governor at 3:10 p.m. on April 17, 2012 | |
2012-04-17 | Assigned Act No. 2012-225. | |
2012-04-17 | Signature Requested | |
2012-04-17 | Enrolled | |
2012-04-17 | Passed Second House | |
2012-04-12 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 712 | |
2012-04-12 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-22 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-03-14 | Engrossed | |
2012-03-14 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure | |
2012-03-08 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 242 | |
2012-03-08 | Rules Petition to cease debate adopted Roll Call 240 | |
2012-03-08 | Scofield motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 241 | |
2012-03-08 | Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities first Substitute Offered | |
2012-03-08 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-01 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2012-02-07 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities |