AL SB138 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Assigned Act No. 2022-287.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Assigned Act No. 2022-287.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Autauga Co., school district ad valorem tax in Central and Daniel Pratt school zones, use for public school purposes in the district, const. amend.
Title
Autauga Co., school district ad valorem tax in Central and Daniel Pratt school zones, use for public school purposes in the district, const. amend.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - House - Smith motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 972 (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 27 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Reed motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 1031 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - Smith motion to Accede Roll Call 816 House appoints Smith, Lawrence and Dismukes (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Reed motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee Roll Call 761 P&PO appoints Chambliss, Reed and Singleton (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - Motion to LOCAL APPLICATION Roll Call 720 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 36 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 719 (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 31 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 718 (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 34 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - HBIR: Smith motion to Adopt Roll Call 717 (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 33 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Chambliss motion to adopt Local Application Resolution Roll Call 99 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 98 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - SBIR: Chambliss motion to Adopt Roll Call 97 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Reed motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 1031 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - Smith motion to Accede Roll Call 816 House appoints Smith, Lawrence and Dismukes (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Reed motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee Roll Call 761 P&PO appoints Chambliss, Reed and Singleton (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - Motion to LOCAL APPLICATION Roll Call 720 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 36 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 719 (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 31 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 718 (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 34 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - HBIR: Smith motion to Adopt Roll Call 717 (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 33 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Chambliss motion to adopt Local Application Resolution Roll Call 99 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 98 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - SBIR: Chambliss motion to Adopt Roll Call 97 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2022-287. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Conference Committee on SB138 2022RS first Substitute Offered |
2022-04-07 | House | Signature Requested |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Concurred in Conference Report |
2022-04-07 | House | Smith motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 972 |
2022-04-07 | House | Conference Report Concurrence Requested |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Reed motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1031 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Conference Report |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2022-03-31 | House | Smith motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 816 House appoints Smith, Lawrence and Dismukes |
2022-03-31 | House | Conference Committee Requested |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Reed motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 761 P&PO appoints Chambliss, Reed and Singleton |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2022-03-29 | House | Mooney intended to vote "Abstain" |
2022-03-29 | House | Local Application Resolution adopted Roll Call 720 |
2022-03-29 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 719 |
2022-03-29 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 718 |
2022-03-29 | House | Mooney intended to vote "Abstain" |
2022-03-29 | House | Local Legislation Amendment Offered |
2022-03-29 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-17 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2022-02-03 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Chambliss motion to adopt Local Application Resolution adopted Roll Call 99 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 98 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |