AL SB138 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-14 - Forwarded to Governor on March 14, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-14 - Forwarded to Governor on March 14, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriations, supplemental appropriations for fiscal year ending September 30, 2013, from Education Trust Fund to Department of Commerce Department of Veterans' Affairs, certain appropriations to Jacksonville State University and State Education Department, extended
Title
Appropriations, supplemental appropriations for fiscal year ending September 30, 2013, from Education Trust Fund to Department of Commerce Department of Veterans' Affairs, certain appropriations to Jacksonville State University and State Education Department, extended
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-14 - Senate - Pittman motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - House - McClendon motion to Previous Question (Y: 66 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 49 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - House - Love motion to Table (Y: 81 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2013-02-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-02-22 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - House - McClendon motion to Previous Question (Y: 66 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 49 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - House - Love motion to Table (Y: 81 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2013-02-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-02-22 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | Senate | Forwarded to Governor on March 14, 2013 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2013-69. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-03-14 | House | Signature Requested |
2013-03-14 | House | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Pittman motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 225 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2013-03-07 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 192 |
2013-03-07 | House | McClendon motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 191 |
2013-03-07 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 190 |
2013-03-07 | House | Love Amendment Offered |
2013-03-07 | House | Love motion to Table adopted Roll Call 189 |
2013-03-07 | House | Ways and Means Education Amendment Offered |
2013-03-07 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-28 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2013-02-21 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Engrossed |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 122 |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Pittman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 121 |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Finance and Taxation Education Amendment Offered |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |