AL SB138 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-26 - Forwarded to Governor at 10:20 a.m. on April 26, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-26 - Forwarded to Governor at 10:20 a.m. on April 26, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Private judges, authorized to appoint for circuit and district courts, qualifications, compensation
Title
Private judges, authorized to appoint for circuit and district courts, qualifications, compensation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-27 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 78 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-26 | Forwarded to Governor at 10:20 a.m. on April 26, 2012 | |
2012-04-26 | Assigned Act No. 2012-266. | |
2012-04-26 | Signature Requested | |
2012-04-26 | Enrolled | |
2012-04-24 | Passed Second House | |
2012-04-24 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 943 | |
2012-04-24 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-05 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-02-23 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary | |
2012-02-23 | Engrossed | |
2012-02-23 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 141 | |
2012-02-23 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 140 | |
2012-02-23 | Reed Amendment Offered | |
2012-02-23 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 139 | |
2012-02-23 | Ward Amendment Offered | |
2012-02-23 | Ward motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 138 | |
2012-02-23 | Judiciary Amendment Offered | |
2012-02-23 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-02-16 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | |
2012-02-07 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |