AL SB137 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-09 - Delivered to Governor at 11:45 p.m. on June 9, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Motor vehicles, liability insurance, verification prior to registration, online insurance verification system established, Revenue Department and law enforcement to electronically verify, Secs. 32-7A-9, 32-7A-10, 32-7A-11, 32-7A-12, 32-7A-13, 32-7A-14, 32-7A-15, 32-7A-16, 32-7A-17, 32-7A-18, 32-7A-19, 32-7A-20, 32-7A-21, 32-7A-22, 32-7A-23, 32-7A-24, 32-7A-25, 32-7B-1, 32-7B-2, 32-7B-3, 32-7B-4, 32-7B-5, 32-7B-6 added; Secs. 32-7-19, 32-7-20, 32-7-22, 32-7-24, 32-7A-2, 32-7A-3, 32-7A-4, 32-7A-5, 32-7A-6, 32-7A-7, 32-7A-8 am'd.; Secs. 32-7A-9, 32-7A-10, 32-7A-11, 32-7A-12, 32-7A-13, 32-7A-14, 32-7A-15, 32-7A-16, 32-7A-17, 32-7A-18, 32-7A-19, 32-7A-20, 32-7A-21, 32-7A-22 repealed and reenacted (2011-21169)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles, liability insurance, verification prior to registration, online insurance verification system established, Revenue Department and law enforcement to electronically verify, Secs. 32-7A-9, 32-7A-10, 32-7A-11, 32-7A-12, 32-7A-13, 32-7A-14, 32-7A-15, 32-7A-16, 32-7A-17, 32-7A-18, 32-7A-19, 32-7A-20, 32-7A-21, 32-7A-22, 32-7A-23, 32-7A-24, 32-7A-25, 32-7B-1, 32-7B-2, 32-7B-3, 32-7B-4, 32-7B-5, 32-7B-6 added; Secs. 32-7-19, 32-7-20, 32-7-22, 32-7-24, 32-7A-2, 32-7A-3, 32-7A-4, 32-7A-5, 32-7A-6, 32-7A-7, 32-7A-8 am'd.; Secs. 32-7A-9, 32-7A-10, 32-7A-11, 32-7A-12, 32-7A-13, 32-7A-14, 32-7A-15, 32-7A-16, 32-7A-17, 32-7A-18, 32-7A-19, 32-7A-20, 32-7A-21, 32-7A-22 repealed and reenacted (2011-21169)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-06-09 - House - Canfield motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - Senate - Orr motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - House - Canfield motion to Accede (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Marsh motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 83 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-09 Delivered to Governor at 11:45 p.m. on June 9, 2011
2011-06-09 Conference Committee on SB137 2011RS first Substitute Offered
2011-06-09 Assigned Act No. 2011-688.
2011-06-09 Signature Requested
2011-06-09 Enrolled
2011-06-09 Concurred in Conference Report
2011-06-09 Canfield motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1173
2011-06-09 Conference Report Concurrence Requested
2011-06-09 Orr motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1069
2011-06-09 Conference Report
2011-06-09 Conference Committee Appointed
2011-06-09 Canfield motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 1145 House appoints Ford, Canfield and McClurkin
2011-06-09 Conference Committee Requested
2011-06-02 Marsh motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 935 P&PO appoints Orr, Scofield and Beasley
2011-06-02 Concurrence Requested
2011-06-02 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1065
2011-06-02 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1066
2011-06-02 Hill Amendment Offered
2011-06-02 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1064
2011-06-02 Black Amendment Offered
2011-06-02 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1063
2011-06-02 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1062
2011-06-02 Insurance Amendment Offered
2011-06-02 Insurance Amendment Offered
2011-06-02 Third Reading Passed
2011-03-24 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments
2011-03-09 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Insurance
2011-03-09 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 29
2011-03-09 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 28
2011-03-09 Orr Amendment Offered
2011-03-09 Engrossed
2011-03-09 Third Reading Passed
2011-03-03 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2011-03-01 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=SB137
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2011RS/PrintFiles/SB137-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2011RS/PrintFiles/SB137-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2011RS/PrintFiles/SB137-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=396954&VOTE=28&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=396955&VOTE=29&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=419045&VOTE=1062&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=419049&VOTE=1063&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=419051&VOTE=1064&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=419060&VOTE=1066&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=419075&VOTE=1065&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=419445&VOTE=935&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=421526&VOTE=1145&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=422029&VOTE=1069&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=422080&VOTE=1173&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback