AL SB136 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-17 - Delivered to Governor at 3:10 p.m. on April 17, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-17 - Delivered to Governor at 3:10 p.m. on April 17, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Certain prefabricated storm shelters excluded from provisions of Title 24, Code of Alabama 1975, surety bond by manufacturers of prefabricated storm shelters required
Title
Certain prefabricated storm shelters excluded from provisions of Title 24, Code of Alabama 1975, surety bond by manufacturers of prefabricated storm shelters required
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-12 - House - Buttram motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-05 - House - Buttram motion to Accede (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2012-04-03 - Senate - Bussman motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-05 - House - Buttram motion to Accede (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2012-04-03 - Senate - Bussman motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-17 | Delivered to Governor at 3:10 p.m. on April 17, 2012 | |
2012-04-17 | Assigned Act No. 2012-224. | |
2012-04-17 | Signature Requested | |
2012-04-17 | Enrolled | |
2012-04-17 | Concurred in Conference Report | |
2012-04-12 | Buttram motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 706 | |
2012-04-12 | Conference Report Concurrence Requested | |
2012-04-12 | Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 590 | |
2012-04-12 | Conference Committee on SB136 2012RS first Substitute Offered | |
2012-04-12 | Conference Report | |
2012-04-05 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2012-04-05 | Buttram motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 600 House appoints Buttram, Wood and Hubbard (J) | |
2012-04-05 | Conference Committee Requested | |
2012-04-03 | Bussman motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 432 P&PO appoints Coleman, Orr and Bussman | |
2012-04-03 | Concurrence Requested | |
2012-03-22 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 545 | |
2012-03-22 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 544 | |
2012-03-22 | Scott Amendment Offered | |
2012-03-22 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-08 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-02-23 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government | |
2012-02-23 | Engrossed | |
2012-02-23 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 130 | |
2012-02-23 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 129 | |
2012-02-23 | Bussman Amendment Offered | |
2012-02-23 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-02-21 | Bussman request unaninmous consent to carry over call of chair granted | |
2012-02-21 | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair | |
2012-02-14 | Reported from Governmental Affairs as Favorable | |
2012-02-07 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |