AL SB136 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-09 - Forwarded to Governor at 3:36 p.m. on June 9, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Elections, campaign finance disclosure reports, electronic filing, frequency increased, Section 527 organization filing requirements, filing of large contributions required, Secretary of State to establish and maintain electronic database, Sec. 17-5-8 am'd. (2011-21174)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections, campaign finance disclosure reports, electronic filing, frequency increased, Section 527 organization filing requirements, filing of large contributions required, Secretary of State to establish and maintain electronic database, Sec. 17-5-8 am'd. (2011-21174)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-06-09 - House - Ball motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 82 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Orr motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - House - Ball motion to Accede (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Marsh motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 79 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 87 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-09 Forwarded to Governor at 3:36 p.m. on June 9, 2011
2011-06-09 Assigned Act No. 2011-687.
2011-06-09 Signature Requested
2011-06-09 Enrolled
2011-06-09 Concurred in Conference Report
2011-06-09 Ball motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1149
2011-06-09 Conference Report Concurrence Requested
2011-06-02 Conference Committee on SB136 2011RS first Substitute Offered.
2011-06-02 Orr motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1036
2011-06-02 Conference Report
2011-06-02 Conference Committee Appointed
2011-06-02 Ball motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 1128 House appoints Ball, Greer and Todd
2011-06-02 Conference Committee Requested
2011-06-02 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1083
2011-06-02 Marsh motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 1011 P&PO appoints P&PO appoints
2011-06-02 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1082
2011-06-02 Wren Amendment Offered
2011-06-02 Concurrence Requested
2011-06-02 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1081
2011-06-02 Ethics and Campaign Finance Amendment Offered
2011-06-02 Third Reading Passed
2011-05-31 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2011-05-25 Referred from CCE to Ethics and Campaign Finance
2011-05-24 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections
2011-05-05 Engrossed
2011-05-05 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 603
2011-05-05 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 602
2011-05-05 Orr first Substitute Offered
2011-05-05 Orr motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
2011-05-05 Orr motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
2011-05-05 Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections Amendment Offered
2011-05-05 Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections Amendment Offered
2011-05-05 Third Reading Passed
2011-03-08 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments
2011-03-01 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=SB136
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2011RS/PrintFiles/SB136-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2011RS/PrintFiles/SB136-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2011RS/PrintFiles/SB136-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=411766&VOTE=602&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=411767&VOTE=603&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=419316&VOTE=1081&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=419455&VOTE=1082&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=419458&VOTE=1083&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=420052&VOTE=1011&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=420258&VOTE=1128&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=420665&VOTE=1036&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=421591&VOTE=1149&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback