AL SB136 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on February 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-25 - Forwarded to Governor on February 25, 2010 at 10:45 a.m. on February 25, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on February 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-25 - Forwarded to Governor on February 25, 2010 at 10:45 a.m. on February 25, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Radiation Control Agency, State, Sunset Law review, continued with modifications, applicants for licensure required to be United States citizens or legally present in the United States, Sec. 22-14-6 am'd. (2010-20327)
Title
Radiation Control Agency, State, Sunset Law review, continued with modifications, applicants for licensure required to be United States citizens or legally present in the United States, Sec. 22-14-6 am'd. (2010-20327)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-25 | Forwarded to Governor on February 25, 2010 at 10:45 a.m. on February 25, 2010 | |
2010-02-25 | Assigned Act No. 2010-146. | |
2010-02-25 | Enrolled | |
2010-02-25 | Signature Requested | |
2010-02-23 | Passed Second House | |
2010-02-23 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 387 | |
2010-02-23 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-02-11 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 103 | |
2010-02-17 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-02-11 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 102 | |
2010-02-11 | Beason first Substitute Offered | |
2010-02-16 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards and Commissions | |
2010-02-11 | Engrossed | |
2010-02-11 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-01-14 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-01-12 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |