AL SB134 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-20 - Pending third reading on day 20 Favorable from Health
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-20 - Pending third reading on day 20 Favorable from Health
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Nursing, Board of, loan repayment program for advanced-practice nurses, loan program authorized for certain currently certified nurses, Sec. 34-21-96 am'd.
Title
Nursing, Board of, loan repayment program for advanced-practice nurses, loan program authorized for certain currently certified nurses, Sec. 34-21-96 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Gerald Dial [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-20 | House | Pending third reading on day 20 Favorable from Health |
2017-04-20 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-03-16 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 405 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-03-16 | Senate | McClendon motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Reported from Health and Human Services as Favorable |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health and Human Services |