AL SB133 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Delivered to Governor at 12:47 p.m. on May 8, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Delivered to Governor at 12:47 p.m. on May 8, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Community development districts, add'l type provided for, including resort areas, marinas, and restaurants meeting certain conditions, Secs. 35-8B-1, 35-8B-2, 35-8B-3 am'd.
Title
Community development districts, add'l type provided for, including resort areas, marinas, and restaurants meeting certain conditions, Secs. 35-8B-1, 35-8B-2, 35-8B-3 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 28 Abs: 35) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Livingston motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Livingston motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Delivered to Governor at 12:47 p.m. on May 8, 2020 |
2020-05-08 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2020-176. |
2020-05-08 | House | Signature Requested |
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-05-08 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2020-05-08 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 543 |
2020-05-08 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2020-03-12 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2020-03-05 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Economic Development and Tourism |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 267 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Livingston motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 266 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Livingston first Substitute Offered |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development as Favorable |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |