AL SB133 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 7:02 p.m. on May 20, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 7:02 p.m. on May 20, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Judge of probate, mental commitments, report to Alabama Criminal Justice Information Center, use for federal background checks regarding purchase of firearms, petition for reinstatement after release from mental commitment to circuit court, appeals to circuit court, use of ACJIC records by probate court, Law Enforcement Information Act, Sec. 22-52-10.8 am'd.
Title
Judge of probate, mental commitments, report to Alabama Criminal Justice Information Center, use for federal background checks regarding purchase of firearms, petition for reinstatement after release from mental commitment to circuit court, appeals to circuit court, use of ACJIC records by probate court, Law Enforcement Information Act, Sec. 22-52-10.8 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-20 - House - DeMarco motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Senate - Pittman motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Senate - Pittman motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | House | Delivered to Governor at 7:02 p.m. on May 20, 2013 |
2013-05-20 | House | Assigned Act No. 2013-290. |
2013-05-20 | House | Signature Requested |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Second House Concurs in Executive Amendment |
2013-05-20 | House | DeMarco motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1229 |
2013-05-20 | House | House of Origin Concurs in Executive Amendment |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Pittman motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1044 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Executive Amendment Offered |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Forwarded to Governor |
2013-05-09 | House | Signature Requested |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2013-05-07 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1123 |
2013-05-07 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-23 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-04-16 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Engrossed |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 413 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Pittman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 411 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Pittman Amendment Offered |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Pittman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 410 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Pittman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 409 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Pittman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 408 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 3 amendments |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |