AL SB131 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Health Savings Accounts, income tax deduction auth. for contributions to, Sec. 40-18-15.6 added.
Title
Health Savings Accounts, income tax deduction auth. for contributions to, Sec. 40-18-15.6 added.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | Senate | Indefinitely Postponed |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Sanford motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |