AL SB131 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-03 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-03 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Elections, voter registration lists, publication by judge of probate on website of co. or Association of Co. Commissioners website, comp., Secs. 17-4-1, 17-4-10, 17-9-5 am'd.
Title
Elections, voter registration lists, publication by judge of probate on website of co. or Association of Co. Commissioners website, comp., Secs. 17-4-1, 17-4-10, 17-9-5 am'd.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | Senate | Indefinitely Postponed |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Sanford motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on County and Municipal Government |