AL SB130 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-13 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 621
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-13 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 621
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Taxation, Alabama Eye Bank, exempt from state, county, and municipal sales and use taxes
Title
Taxation, Alabama Eye Bank, exempt from state, county, and municipal sales and use taxes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-13 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Waggoner motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Waggoner motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 621 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 620 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Finance and Taxation Education Amendment Offered |
2017-04-18 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Engrossed |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |