AL SB13 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - Judiciary first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - Judiciary first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Municipal corporations, ordinances, issuance of summons and complaint in lieu of custodial arrest, further provided for, Sec. 11-45-9.1 am'd.
Title
Municipal corporations, ordinances, issuance of summons and complaint in lieu of custodial arrest, further provided for, Sec. 11-45-9.1 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Melson [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | House | Judiciary first Amendment Offered |
2019-05-22 | House | Pending third reading on day 24 Favorable from Judiciary with 1 amendment |
2019-05-22 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2019-05-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 558 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |