AL SB13 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 16 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-01-25 - Judiciary first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Marriage license, recording by judge of probate, transmission to Vital Statistics office, Secs. 30-1-9, 30-1-10, 30-1-11, 30-1-13, 30-1-14 repealed; Secs. 22-9A-17, 30-1-5, 30-1-12, 30-1-16 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marriage license, recording by judge of probate, transmission to Vital Statistics office, Secs. 30-1-9, 30-1-10, 30-1-11, 30-1-13, 30-1-14 repealed; Secs. 22-9A-17, 30-1-5, 30-1-12, 30-1-16 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-25HouseJudiciary first Amendment Offered
2018-01-25HousePending third reading on day 7 Favorable from Judiciary with 1 amendment
2018-01-25HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2018-01-18HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
2018-01-16SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 41
2018-01-16SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-01-11SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-09SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback