AL SB13 | 2015 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-15 - Assigned Act No. 2015-556.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Motor vehicles, ad valorem taxes, deferral of certain taxes on certain new motor vehicles removed, Motor Vehicle Ad Valorem Tax Fairness Act, Sec. 40-12-253 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles, ad valorem taxes, deferral of certain taxes on certain new motor vehicles removed, Motor Vehicle Ad Valorem Tax Fairness Act, Sec. 40-12-253 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-09-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 76 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-09-15SenateAssigned Act No. 2015-556.
2015-09-15SenateEnrolled
2015-09-15HouseSignature Requested
2015-09-15SenatePassed Second House
2015-09-15HouseHall intended to vote "Nay"
2015-09-15HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 51
2015-09-15HouseThird Reading Passed
2015-09-14HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-09-10HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
2015-09-10SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 10
2015-09-10SenateThird Reading Passed
2015-09-09SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-09-08SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback