AL SB128 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Community College System, tenure and discipline of faculty and staff hired on or after June 1, 2020, pursuant to policy adopted by Board of Trustees of Alabama Community College System in lieu of Students First Act of 2011, Secs. 16-60-111.4, 16-60-111.7 am'd.
Title
Community College System, tenure and discipline of faculty and staff hired on or after June 1, 2020, pursuant to policy adopted by Board of Trustees of Alabama Community College System in lieu of Students First Act of 2011, Secs. 16-60-111.4, 16-60-111.7 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Roberts [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Roberts motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Roberts motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 404 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Roberts motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Roberts motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 391 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Education Policy Amendment Offered |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education Policy |