AL SB127 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-17 - Conference Committee on SB127 2016RS first Substitute Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-17 - Conference Committee on SB127 2016RS first Substitute Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Theft of cargo in commercial transportation and fifth wheel tampering, crimes defined, penalties, Secs. 13A-8-3.1, 13A-8-3.2 added; Sec. 13A-8-1 am'd.
Title
Theft of cargo in commercial transportation and fifth wheel tampering, crimes defined, penalties, Secs. 13A-8-3.1, 13A-8-3.2 added; Sec. 13A-8-1 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-15 - House - Pringle motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 88 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Williams motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - Pringle motion to Accede (Y: 101 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Williams motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 88 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 64 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - Pringle motion to Table (Y: 29 N: 62 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Williams motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Williams motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - Pringle motion to Accede (Y: 101 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Williams motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 88 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 64 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - Pringle motion to Table (Y: 29 N: 62 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Williams motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-17 | Senate | Conference Committee on SB127 2016RS first Substitute Offered |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2016-109. |
2016-03-17 | House | Signature Requested |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Concurred in Conference Report |
2016-03-15 | House | Pringle motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 309 |
2016-03-15 | House | Conference Report Concurrence Requested |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Williams motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 419 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Conference Report |
2016-03-08 | House | Conference Committee Requested |
2016-03-08 | House | Pringle motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 244 House appoints Pringle, Jones and Black |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Williams motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 301 P&PO appoints Ward, Williams, Phil and Figures |
2016-03-01 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 206 |
2016-03-01 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 205 |
2016-03-01 | House | Pringle motion to Table lost Roll Call 204 |
2016-03-01 | House | Jones Amendment Offered |
2016-03-01 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2016-02-24 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-02-16 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Engrossed |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 91 |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Williams motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 90 |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |