AL SB126 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-01 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-01 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
University of South Alabama, board of trustees, members, term decreased, chair pro tempore authorized to call special meetings, Secs. 16-55-2, 16-55-5, 16-55-6 am'd.
Title
University of South Alabama, board of trustees, members, term decreased, chair pro tempore authorized to call special meetings, Secs. 16-55-2, 16-55-5, 16-55-6 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Rusty Glover [R] | Sen. George Keahey [D] | Sen. Bill Hightower [R] | Sen. Vivian Figures [D] |
Sen. Trip Pittman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-01 | Senate | Indefinitely Postponed |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Glover motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education |