AL SB126 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-22 - Delivered to Governor at 12:12 p.m. on April 22, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-22 - Delivered to Governor at 12:12 p.m. on April 22, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Respiratory Therapy Board, continued until October 1, 2016, pursuant to Sunset Law.
Title
Respiratory Therapy Board, continued until October 1, 2016, pursuant to Sunset Law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-22 | Delivered to Governor at 12:12 p.m. on April 22, 2012 | |
2012-03-22 | Assigned Act No. 2012-113. | |
2012-03-22 | Signature Requested | |
2012-03-22 | Enrolled | |
2012-03-22 | Passed Second House | |
2012-03-22 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 484 | |
2012-03-22 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-20 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-03-08 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions | |
2012-03-08 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 228 | |
2012-03-08 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-02-16 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-02-07 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health |