AL SB124 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-08 - Assigned Act No. 2022-138.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-08 - Assigned Act No. 2022-138.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Broadband, revising broadband accessibility grant program, increasing minimum threshold speed, expanding program to governmental entities, revising grant application process, Sec. 41-23-211, 41-23-212, 41-23-213, 41-23-214 am'd.
Title
Broadband, revising broadband accessibility grant program, increasing minimum threshold speed, expanding program to governmental entities, revising grant application process, Sec. 41-23-211, 41-23-212, 41-23-213, 41-23-214 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Senate - Reed motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 486 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 462 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 461 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - HBIR: Shedd motion to Adopt Roll Call 460 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 208 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Scofield motion to Adopt Roll Call 207 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 207 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 206 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 184 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Scofield motion to Adopt Roll Call 183 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - SBIR: Scofield motion to Adopt Roll Call 182 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 462 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 461 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - HBIR: Shedd motion to Adopt Roll Call 460 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 208 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Scofield motion to Adopt Roll Call 207 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 207 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 206 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 184 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Scofield motion to Adopt Roll Call 183 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - SBIR: Scofield motion to Adopt Roll Call 182 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2022-138. |
2022-03-08 | House | Signature Requested |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-08 | House | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Reed motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 486 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2022-03-03 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 462 |
2022-03-03 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 461 |
2022-03-03 | House | Urban and Rural Development Amendment Offered |
2022-03-03 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-23 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2022-02-10 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Urban and Rural Development |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Engrossed |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Scofield motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 207 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 208 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Scofield Amendment Offered |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 184 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Reed motion to Reconsider adopted Voice Vote |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Scofield motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 183 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development Amendment Offered |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development Amendment Offered |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 23 | 211 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 23 | 212 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 23 | 213 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 23 | 214 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |