AL SB124 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-01 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-01 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Conservation and Natural Resources Department, whitetail deer, hunting season extended before and after regular gun deer season, Sec. 9-11-244 am'd.
Title
Conservation and Natural Resources Department, whitetail deer, hunting season extended before and after regular gun deer season, Sec. 9-11-244 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Dick Brewbaker [R] | Sen. Rusty Glover [R] | Sen. George Keahey [D] | Sen. Greg Reed [R] |
Sen. Thomas Whatley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-01 | Indefinitely Postponed | |
2011-05-25 | Beason motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote | |
2011-05-25 | Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry first Substitute Offered | |
2011-05-25 | Third Reading Carried Over | |
2011-03-24 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2011-03-01 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry |