AL SB123 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-03 - Assigned Act No. 2022-125.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-03 - Assigned Act No. 2022-125.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Broadband, Connect Alabama Act of 2021 amended, minimum service threshold increased, Alabama Digital Expansion Division chief authorized to enter nondisclosure agreements, Connect Alabama Fund expenditure amended, Secs. 41-23-271, 41-23-273, 41-23-274 am'd.
Title
Broadband, Connect Alabama Act of 2021 amended, minimum service threshold increased, Alabama Digital Expansion Division chief authorized to enter nondisclosure agreements, Connect Alabama Fund expenditure amended, Secs. 41-23-271, 41-23-273, 41-23-274 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 459 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - HBIR: Shedd motion to Adopt Roll Call 458 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 181 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Scofield motion to Adopt Roll Call 180 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - SBIR: Scofield motion to Adopt Roll Call 179 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - HBIR: Shedd motion to Adopt Roll Call 458 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 181 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Scofield motion to Adopt Roll Call 180 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - SBIR: Scofield motion to Adopt Roll Call 179 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2022-125. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-03 | House | Signature Requested |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2022-03-03 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 459 |
2022-03-03 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-23 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-10 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Urban and Rural Development |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Engrossed |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 181 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Scofield motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 180 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development Amendment Offered |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
Same As/Similar To
HB189 (Same As) 2022-02-01 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Urban and Rural Development
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 23 | 271 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 23 | 273 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 23 | 274 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |