AL SB123 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Assigned Act No. 2019-184.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Assigned Act No. 2019-184.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue Dept, income tax refunds, set off debt collection, sums collected on behalf of claimant agency under agreements with certain health care authorities are considered debts, Sec. 40-18-100 am'd.
Title
Revenue Dept, income tax refunds, set off debt collection, sums collected on behalf of claimant agency under agreements with certain health care authorities are considered debts, Sec. 40-18-100 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Melson [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Allen motion to Table (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Allen motion to Table (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2019-184. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 647 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2019-05-02 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 492 |
2019-05-02 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 491 |
2019-05-08 | House | Signature Requested |
2019-05-02 | House | Allen Amendment Offered |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-05-02 | House | Allen motion to Table adopted Roll Call 490 |
2019-05-07 | House | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2019-05-02 | House | State Government Amendment Offered |
2019-05-02 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-18 | House | Acted on by State Government as Favorable with 1 amendment |
2019-04-03 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 135 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |