AL SB123 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-19 - Boyd intended to vote "Yea"
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Accountability Act of 2013, cap on income tax credits increased, credit against utility gross receipts tax liability for donations to scholarship granting organizations created, audits of scholarship granting entities required, Secs. 16-6D-3, 16-6D-4, 16-6D-6, 16-6D-8, 16-6D-9 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Accountability Act of 2013, cap on income tax credits increased, credit against utility gross receipts tax liability for donations to scholarship granting organizations created, audits of scholarship granting entities required, Secs. 16-6D-3, 16-6D-4, 16-6D-6, 16-6D-8, 16-6D-9 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 59 NV: 2 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2017-05-19 - House - Johnson (K) motion to Table pending Roll Call 1028 (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 86 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 85 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 17 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Ross motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19HouseBoyd intended to vote "Yea"
2017-05-19HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass lost Roll Call 1031
2017-05-19HouseLost in second house
2017-05-19HouseJohnson (K) motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
2017-05-19HouseJohnson (K) motion to Table adopted Roll Call 1028
2017-05-19HouseWays and Means Education Amendment Offered
2017-05-19HouseThird Reading Carried Over
2017-04-11HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2017-02-23HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
2017-02-23SenateEngrossed
2017-02-23SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 107
2017-02-23SenateRoss motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 106
2017-02-23SenateRoss Amendment Offered
2017-02-23SenateThird Reading Passed
2017-02-21SenateMarsh motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2017-02-21SenateMarsh motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 103
2017-02-21SenateMarsh first Substitute Offered
2017-02-21SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2017-02-16SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-02-09SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB123&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/SB123-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/SB123-eng.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=559736&VOTE=103&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=560150&VOTE=106&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=560158&VOTE=107&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=564992&VOTE=324&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=564993&VOTE=325&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=579007&VOTE=1028&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=579189&VOTE=1031&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback