AL SB123 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Municipal public housing authorities, eminent domain power deleted, purchase of property authorized only for public housing purposes, five-year plan and annual recommendations, submission to city council and county commission if authority serves part of county, public hearing and approval, Secs. 24-1-28, 24-1-43 am'd.
Title
Municipal public housing authorities, eminent domain power deleted, purchase of property authorized only for public housing purposes, five-year plan and annual recommendations, submission to city council and county commission if authority serves part of county, public hearing and approval, Secs. 24-1-28, 24-1-43 am'd.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Indefinitely Postponed | |
2010-04-06 | Request to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair Granted | |
2010-04-06 | Orr first Substitute Offered | |
2010-04-06 | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair | |
2010-01-19 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-01-12 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |