AL SB121 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Assigned Act No. 2018-261.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Assigned Act No. 2018-261.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles, distinctive license plates, parent or guardian of a disabled person authorized to apply for a disability access license plate, Sec. 40-12-300 am'd.
Title
Motor vehicles, distinctive license plates, parent or guardian of a disabled person authorized to apply for a disability access license plate, Sec. 40-12-300 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - Senate - Chambliss motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2018-261. |
2018-03-13 | House | Signature Requested |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-08 | House | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Chambliss motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 755 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2018-03-08 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 652 |
2018-03-08 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 651 |
2018-03-08 | House | Johnson (K) Amendment Offered |
2018-03-08 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-08 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-01-30 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 158 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |