AL SB121 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Assigned Act No. 2014-218.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Assigned Act No. 2014-218.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Patents, asserting claims of infringment of in bad faith prohibited, Attorney General authorized to investigate and initiate enforcement actions, targets of bad faith assertions authorized to initiate action for certain damages, filing of bond under certain conditions
Title
Patents, asserting claims of infringment of in bad faith prohibited, Attorney General authorized to investigate and initiate enforcement actions, targets of bad faith assertions authorized to initiate action for certain damages, filing of bond under certain conditions
Sponsors
Sen. Arthur Orr [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-18 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - Motion to Again Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - Motion to Again Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | House | Assigned Act No. 2014-218. |
2014-03-18 | House | Signature Requested |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-03-18 | House | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 791 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2014-03-13 | House | Motion to Again Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 790 |
2014-03-13 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 789 |
2014-03-13 | House | Williams (P) Amendment Offered |
2014-03-13 | House | Williams (P) motion to Reconsider adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-13 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 785 |
2014-03-13 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 784 |
2014-03-13 | House | Technology and Research first Substitute Offered |
2014-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-06 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2014-01-30 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Technology and Research |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Engrossed |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 224 |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 223 |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Fiscal Responsibility and Accountability Amendment Offered |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 222 |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Fiscal Responsibility and Accountability Amendment Offered |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Accountability |