AL SB119 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-31 - Indefinitely Postpone
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-31 - Indefinitely Postpone
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to courts; to amend Section 12-15-204, Code of Alabama 1975, to require a person who is 16 years of age or older to be tried as an adult for any felony offense involving the use of a dangerous instrument against an employee of a juvenile detention center or the Department of Youth Services; and to make nonsubstantive, technical revisions to update the existing code language to current style.
Title
Relating to courts; to amend Section 12-15-204, Code of Alabama 1975, to require a person who is 16 years of age or older to be tried as an adult for any felony offense involving the use of a dangerous instrument against an employee of a juvenile detention center or the Department of Youth Services; and to make nonsubstantive, technical revisions to update the existing code language to current style.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-31 | Senate | Indefinitely Postpone |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Carry Over |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Carry Over to the Call of the Chair |
2023-04-11 | Senate | On Third Reading in House of Origin |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Read Second Time in House of Origin |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Reported Favorably from Senate Judiciary |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Read First Time in House of Origin |