AL SB118 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - Assigned Act No. 2015-163.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - Assigned Act No. 2015-163.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Certified public accountants, qualifications revised, education requirements revised, Sec. 34-1-4 am'd.
Title
Certified public accountants, qualifications revised, education requirements revised, Sec. 34-1-4 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-30 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-05 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2015-163. |
2015-05-05 | House | Signature Requested |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-05-05 | House | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 710 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2015-04-30 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 571 |
2015-04-30 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 570 |
2015-04-30 | House | Boards, Agencies and Commissions Amendment Offered |
2015-04-30 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-04-16 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2015-04-07 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Engrossed |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 314 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 313 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Chambliss Amendment Offered |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |