AL SB117 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-31 - Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-31 - Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Controlled substances, Schedule I, cathinone compounds, included and subject to regulation and penalties, duties to State Board of Health
Title
Controlled substances, Schedule I, cathinone compounds, included and subject to regulation and penalties, duties to State Board of Health
Sponsors
Sen. William Beasley [D] | Sen. Roger Bedford [D] | Sen. Jerry Fielding [D] | Sen. Bill Holtzclaw [R] |
Sen. Tammy Irons [D] | Sen. Del Marsh [R] | Sen. Arthur Orr [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-31 | Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Judiciary | |
2011-05-31 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-05-05 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary | |
2011-05-05 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 554 | |
2011-05-05 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-24 | Reported from Judiciary as Favorable | |
2011-03-01 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |