AL SB116 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Assigned Act No. 2014-419.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Assigned Act No. 2014-419.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public assistance benefits, purchase of alcoholic beverages, tobacco products, and lottery tickets with, prohibited, use of benefit funds in certain establishments prohibited, penalties for violations, Human Resources Department required to perform monthly matches to determine eligibility regarding incarceration or whether recipient is deceased
Title
Public assistance benefits, purchase of alcoholic beverages, tobacco products, and lottery tickets with, prohibited, use of benefit funds in certain establishments prohibited, penalties for violations, Human Resources Department required to perform monthly matches to determine eligibility regarding incarceration or whether recipient is deceased
Sponsors
Sen. Arthur Orr [R] | Sen. Clay Scofield [R] | Sen. Trip Pittman [R] | Sen. Bill Holtzclaw [R] |
Sen. Gerald Allen [R] | Sen. Scott Beason [R] | Sen. Bryan Taylor [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-08 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 38 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2014-04-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 80 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - Hammon motion to Previous Question (Y: 64 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 80 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - Hammon motion to Previous Question (Y: 64 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2014-419. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-04-03 | House | Signature Requested |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2014-04-02 | House | Mitchell dissent filed |
2014-04-02 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1076 |
2014-04-02 | House | Hammon motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 1075 |
2014-04-02 | House | Motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 1074 |
2014-04-02 | House | Clarke Amendment Offered |
2014-04-02 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-04-01 | House | Third Reading Placed on the Calendar |
2014-03-13 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-02-27 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Engrossed |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 540 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 539 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Fiscal Responsibility and Accountability Amendment Offered |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Accountability |