AL SB115 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Assigned Act No. 2014-425.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Assigned Act No. 2014-425.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Temporary Assistance for Needy Families (TANF), applicants for required to apply for at least three positions of unsubsidized employment, ineligibility under certain conditions, Secs.38-4-2, 38-4-4, 38-11A-2 am'd.
Title
Temporary Assistance for Needy Families (TANF), applicants for required to apply for at least three positions of unsubsidized employment, ineligibility under certain conditions, Secs.38-4-2, 38-4-4, 38-11A-2 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Arthur Orr [R] | Sen. Bryan Taylor [R] | Sen. Gerald Allen [R] | Sen. Trip Pittman [R] |
Sen. Clay Scofield [R] | Sen. Scott Beason [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-03 - Senate - Orr motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 70 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - Hammon motion to Previous Question (Y: 66 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 73 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 22 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 70 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - Hammon motion to Previous Question (Y: 66 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 73 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 22 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | House | Assigned Act No. 2014-425. |
2014-04-03 | House | Signature Requested |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-04-03 | House | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Orr motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1164 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2014-04-02 | House | Mitchell dissent filed |
2014-04-02 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1098 |
2014-04-02 | House | Hammon motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 1096 |
2014-04-02 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1097 |
2014-04-02 | House | Roberts Amendment Offered |
2014-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-03-13 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-02-27 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Engrossed |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 537 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 536 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Orr Amendment Offered |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Accountability |