AL SB115 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-22 - Delivered to Governor at 12:12 p.m. on March 22, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-22 - Delivered to Governor at 12:12 p.m. on March 22, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Alabama Board of Electrical Contractors, continued, applicants for licensure be United States citizens or legally present in US, Sec. 34-36-7 am'd (2012-20361)
Title
Alabama Board of Electrical Contractors, continued, applicants for licensure be United States citizens or legally present in US, Sec. 34-36-7 am'd (2012-20361)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-22 | Delivered to Governor at 12:12 p.m. on March 22, 2012 | |
2012-03-22 | Assigned Act No. 2012-102. | |
2012-03-22 | Signature Requested | |
2012-03-22 | Enrolled | |
2012-03-22 | Passed Second House | |
2012-03-22 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 462 | |
2012-03-22 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-20 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-03-15 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions | |
2012-03-15 | Engrossed | |
2012-03-15 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 274 | |
2012-03-15 | Pittman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 273 | |
2012-03-15 | Pittman first Substitute Offered | |
2012-03-15 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-02-28 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-02-07 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |